Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Audishu V (Georges Ebed-Iesu) Khayyath

Deceased

Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1827Born
1855¹27.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 186032.9Ordained BishopBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
1863²35.2ResignedBishop of Amadiyah (Chaldean), Iraq
28 Mar 187951.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
28 Oct 189467.0SelectedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
18 Mar 189567.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq
6 Nov 189972.0DiedPatriarch of Babylon {Babilonia} (Chaldean), Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Audishu V (Georges Ebed-Iesu) Khayyath (VIAF: 279931838)
Patriarch Audishu V (Georges Ebed-Iesu) Khayyath (born , died ) Patriarch of Babylon {Babilonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mossul

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,338
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 137, and Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017