Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Souleyman Moussa Sabbagh

Deceased

Archbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1865Born
8 Apr 188823.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 189732.2AppointedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
19 Sep 189732.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey
2 Jun 192358.1DiedArchbishop of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Souleyman Moussa Sabbagh
Archbishop Souleyman Moussa Sabbagh (born , died ) Archbishop of Diarbekir (Amida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
Ordained BishopMossul, Archeparchy of Mossul (Chaldean), Iraq
Death PlaceDiarbekir, Eparchy of Diarbekir (Amida) (Chaldean)

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,356
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 244
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast