Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Indelli

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornMonopoli
1 Jul 162432.5AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
7 Jul 162432.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
28 Oct 162937.8DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Indelli:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Indelli (died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 85, Number 506
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,003

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013