Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Basile Ephrem Hikary (Hykary)

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Amastris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1881BornSeert
22 May 190422.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 193654.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amastris
29 Aug 193655.0ConfirmedTitular Bishop of Amastris
4 Oct 193655.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amastris
9 Feb 195876.4DiedTitular Bishop of Amastris

MicroData Summary for Basile Ephrem Hikary (Hykary):
Bishop Basile Ephrem Hikary (Hykary) (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Amastris

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013