Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hanna Hebbé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian)

Titular Bishop of Urima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1883²BornGezireh
15 May 190724.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 193350.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
18 May 193350.4SelectedTitular Bishop of Urima
1 Oct 193350.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urima
16 Oct 193350.8ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon
2 Nov 195774.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Syrian), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hanna Hebbé:
Bishop Hanna Hebbé (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013