Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm von Hohnstein

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475¹Born
4 Dec 150631.9SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
14 Dec 150631.9ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
28 Mar 1507³32.2Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
29 Jun 154166.4DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm von Hohnstein (VIAF: 1424895)
Bishop Wilhelm von Hohnstein (born 1475, died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Strasbourg, Diocese of Strasbourg

  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1507, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast