Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Höwen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1491SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
9 Sep 1491ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
16 Oct 1491Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
6 Jun 1505ResignedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
30 Jun 1520DiedBishop Emeritus of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Höwen
Bishop Heinrich von Höwen (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chur

  • a bishop for 28.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 141
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,904

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 May 2018

Quantcast