Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernst Herzog von Sachsen

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1464³Born
147611.5SelectedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
19 Mar 147914.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
1485¹20.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 148925.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
3 Aug 151349.1DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ernst Herzog von Sachsen
Archbishop Ernst Herzog von Sachsen (born , died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,778
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 7,033

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016