Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Schertlin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1448Born
18 Dec 148638.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
18 Dec 148638.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
2 Mar 148840.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
14 Mar 151163.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Schertlin
Bishop Heinrich Schertlin (born 1448, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonberg
Ordained BishopSanta Maria dell’Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 250
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,934
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1488, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast