Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Rhein (Bayern)

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1486Born
12 Feb 151327.0SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
22 Jun 151327.3ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
7 Jul 151529.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 151529.4Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
27 Sep 152943.6DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg von Rhein (Bayern)
Bishop Georg von Rhein (Bayern) (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg
Ordained BishopSpeyer, Diocese of Speyer

  • a priest for 14.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1515, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast