Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann von Bayern (Rhein)

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1429BornSimmern
11 Apr 145728.3AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
1 Apr 145829.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
25 Nov 145930.9Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
Dec 146435.9SelectedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
20 May 146536.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
11 May 146637.4InstalledArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
13 Dec 147546.9DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Bayern (Rhein):
Archbishop Johann von Bayern (Rhein) (died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,611
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013