Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Clausse de Marchamont

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1571AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
11 May 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
12 Sep 1573DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Clausse de Marchamont
Bishop Nicolas Clausse de Marchamont (died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChalons sur Marne, Diocese of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Feb 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast