Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Guérin

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse, France


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1630AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
1 Aug 1630Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
7 Apr 1632³DiedBishop of Grasse, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Guérin
Bishop Jean Guérin (died ) Bishop of Grasse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClermont Ferrand

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • d: Google Books
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast