Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Giorgi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536¹Born
14 Aug 160670.6AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
20 Aug 160670.6Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
24 Nov 160872.8DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Giorgi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Giorgi O.S.B. (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubrovnik, Archdiocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 321
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 50
  • ob/c2: AT, 30 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast