Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ignazio Gautier

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1726BornMontis Regalis
21 Sep 174822.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 177246.3SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
7 Sep 177246.5ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
4 Oct 177246.6Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
Oct 1773³47.6DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ignazio Gautier:
Bishop Giovanni Ignazio Gautier (born ) Bishop of Iglesias

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013