Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele de Gattis

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1787Born
21 Sep 181124.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 183749.7SelectedBishop of Venosa, Italy
2 Oct 183750.0ConfirmedBishop of Venosa, Italy
19 Nov 183750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
23 Apr 184759.5DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele de Gattis
Bishop Michele de Gattis (born , died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRogliano

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 393
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast