Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelin (Joseph Jakob) Geiselmayer, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1744Born
10 Aug 176117.0ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
12 Aug 178541.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
12 Aug 178541.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
19 Feb 178641.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
12 Jul 178641.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

MicroData Summary for Angelin (Joseph Jakob) Geiselmayer
Bishop Angelin (Joseph Jakob) Geiselmayer O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast