Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Antoni Pleszowice Fredro

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1673³BornPrzemyśl
28 Oct 170026.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Oct 170026.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 171945.2AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
May 1719²45.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
27 Sep 172450.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
26 Apr 173460.3DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Antoni Pleszowice Fredro:
Bishop Alexander Antoni Pleszowice Fredro (born , died ) Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,449
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157, and Page 324
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015