Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Szembek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Mactaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1686³BornŚwięciechowa
15 Jun 171023.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Sep 171024.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 172437.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
12 Jun 172437.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
Jan 1725²38.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
Aug 1728³42.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Szembek:
Bishop Franciscus Szembek (born , died Aug 1728) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 17.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 256
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015