Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Bousmard

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1512¹Born
27 Feb 157664.1AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
15 Jul 157664.5Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
10 Apr 158472.2DiedBishop of Verdun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Bousmard
Bishop Nicolas Bousmard (born 1512, died ) Bishop of Verdun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXivry-le-Franc
Ordained BishopS. Martin, Church, Sorcy, Meuse
Death PlaceVerdun, Diocese of Verdun

  • a bishop for 7.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 335
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1576, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast