Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paperone de’ Papareschi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1265AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
27 Jun 1265Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
21 Jul 1285AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
4 Mar 1290DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paperone de’ Papareschi:
Bishop Paperone de’ Papareschi O.P. (died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,002

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Mar 2014