Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Villahoz

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1268AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
3 Sep 1268Ordained BishopBishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Aug 1269DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Villahoz:
Bishop Juan Villahoz (died ) Bishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 1.0 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 297, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 17 Feb 2014