Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste de Forbin de Solliers

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹Born
21 Feb 162858.1AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
9 Apr 162858.2Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
5 Apr 163868.2DiedBishop of Toulon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Auguste de Forbin de Solliers
Bishop Auguste de Forbin de Solliers (born 1570, died ) Bishop of Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSollies-Pont

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 339
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast