Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Flores Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1674³Born
22 Dec 172753.7AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
4 Apr 172854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
3 Mar 173863.9AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
26 Nov 175985.6DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Flores Osorio
Bishop José Flores Osorio (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonferrada

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 45, Number 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast