Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crisóstomo Vargas, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1723AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
10 Oct 1723Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
14 May 1728DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Crisóstomo Vargas
Bishop Crisóstomo Vargas O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,646
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 41, Number 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast