Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Ferretti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lavello, Italy

Bishop of Milos (Melos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1482¹Born
4 Feb 154159.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
4 Feb 154159.0AppointedBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
1542¹60.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
5 Feb 154563.0Ordained BishopBishop of Milos (Melos), Greece
5 Mar 155068.1AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
1554¹72.0ResignedBishop of Lavello, Italy
7 May 155775.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Lavello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Ferretti (VIAF: 304914154)
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Ferretti (born 1482, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lavello

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 221, and Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 2
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 7,592

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast