Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquim da Cunha Azeredo Coutinho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1742BornSão Salvador dos Campos dos Goytacazes
24 Jun 178643.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Jun 178643.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 179451.8SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
12 Sep 179452.0ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
25 Jan 179552.3Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
27 Jan 180663.3SelectedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
6 Oct 180664.0ConfirmedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
20 May 182077.6ResignedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
12 Sep 182179.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for José Joaquim da Cunha Azeredo Coutinho
Bishop José Joaquim da Cunha Azeredo Coutinho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Elvas

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,917
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016