Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ferreira de Azevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Goiás


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1765³BornBahia
24 Mar 178722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Mar 178823.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 182055.3AppointedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil
29 May 182055.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
29 Sep 183368.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
11 Sep 184378.6SelectedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
25 Jul 184479.5ConfirmedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
12 Aug 185489.5DiedBishop of Goiás, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ferreira de Azevedo:
Bishop Francisco Ferreira de Azevedo (born , died ) Bishop of Goiás

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 140, and Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013