Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonino Faraone

Deceased

Bishop of Catania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1562AppointedBishop of Cefalù, Italy
9 Feb 1569AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
29 Jul 1572DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonino Faraone
Bishop Antonino Faraone (died ) Bishop of Catania

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 163, and Page 159
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,291
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast