Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Faraone

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569¹Born
7 Oct 161950.7AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
28 Oct 161950.8Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
12 Nov 162960.8DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Faraone
Bishop Paolo Faraone (born 1569, died ) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 325
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 66, Number 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast