Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Spinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1661Born
6 Apr 169231.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 171352.5AppointedBishop of Ugento, Italy
3 Sep 171352.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
5 Jun 171857.3DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Spinelli
Bishop Nicola Spinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapaccio

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 397
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast