Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Valentine Egwuchukwu Ezeonyia, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aba, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1941Born
3 Aug 196827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
2 Apr 199048.9AppointedBishop of Aba, Nigeria
1 Jul 199049.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aba, Nigeria
8 Feb 201573.8DiedBishop of Aba, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Vincent Valentine Egwuchukwu Ezeonyia
Bishop Vincent Valentine Egwuchukwu Ezeonyia C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Aba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUke

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,976
  • d: CB, 9 Feb 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast