Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Espinosa y Dávalos

Deceased

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1793BornTepic
Mar 1816³22.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
20 Oct 181623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Sep 185360.2AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
8 Jan 185460.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
26 Jan 186369.6AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Mar 186369.7InstalledArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Nov 186673.4DiedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Espinosa y Dávalos:
Archbishop Pedro Espinosa y Dávalos (born , died ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,231
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013