Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Maria Ercolani, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1815AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
24 Sep 1815Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
19 Apr 1822AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
27 Dec 1847DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Maria Ercolani:
Bishop Fortunato Maria Ercolani C.P. (died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 152, and Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013