Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovan Mario de Alessandri

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1567AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
18 Oct 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
9 Feb 1573AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
1585DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovan Mario de Alessandri
Bishop Giovan Mario de Alessandri (died 1585) Bishop of Mileto

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263, and Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast