Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Riario

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1543Born
8 Nov 157026.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
24 Aug 157228.7Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
21 Feb 157834.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 157834.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
May 1581³37.4AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
18 Jul 158541.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Riario (VIAF: 89352911)
Alessandro Cardinal Riario (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)In front of main altar, Ss. XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Giacomo, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 20, Number 81
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 2 Jul 2018

Quantcast