Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso María Binarini

Deceased

Bishop of Camerino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
18 Jul 157262.5AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
25 Jul 157262.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
30 Aug 157464.6AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
26 Apr 158070.3DiedBishop of Camerino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso María Binarini (VIAF: 90272945)
Bishop Alfonso María Binarini (born 1510, died ) Bishop of Camerino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCamerino, Diocese of Camerino

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283, and Page 149
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 20, Number 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast