Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Villars (III)

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
1 Jul 161325.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vienne, France
1 Jul 161325.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
29 Jun 161527.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
18 Jan 162638.0SucceededArchbishop of Vienne, France
25 May 166274.3DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Villars (III)
Archbishop Pierre de Villars (III) (born 1588, died ) Archbishop of Vienne

  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 183, and Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast