Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Antoine de Fay-Perault

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583¹BornArles
21 Oct 161330.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Uzés, France
21 Oct 161330.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
1614¹31.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
20 Nov 162037.8SucceededBishop of Uzés, France
4 Apr 163350.2DiedBishop of Uzés, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul-Antoine de Fay-Perault:
Bishop Paul-Antoine de Fay-Perault (born 1583, died ) Bishop of Uzés

  • a bishop for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 354, and Page 200
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 1 Dec 2015