Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Armand de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
5 Oct 169148.7SelectedBishop of Die, France
7 Jul 169249.5ConfirmedBishop of Die, France
7 Sep 169249.6Ordained BishopBishop of Die, France
10 Apr 169451.2SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
19 Jul 169451.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
30 Nov 169451.9InstalledArchbishop of Vienne, France
6 Oct 171370.7DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Armand de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem
Archbishop Armand de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem (born 1643, died ) Archbishop of Vienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontaret de Souvigny

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184, and Page 414
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast