Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Albuquerque, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
8 Nov 1562Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
23 Jul 1579DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Albuquerque:
Bishop Bernardo de Albuquerque O.P. (died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,817

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013