Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francescantonio de Marco

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1628³BornHydruntin
5 May 166637.7AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
18 Mar 168152.6DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francescantonio de Marco:
Bishop Francescantonio de Marco (born , died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013