Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino (Jean) de Soria, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Feb 1529AppointedBishop of Ravello, Italy
11 Apr 1529Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello, Italy
2 Jun 1536AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
1548¹DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino (Jean) de Soria
Bishop Bernardino (Jean) de Soria O.F.M. (died 1548) Bishop of Venafro

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,774
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328, and Page 282
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 41, Number 202
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1529, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast