Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Révol

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548²Born
5 Nov 160355.8AppointedBishop of Dol, France
4 Jan 160456.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
6 Aug 162981.5DiedBishop of Dol, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Révol
Bishop Antoine de Révol (born 1548, died ) Bishop of Dol

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast