Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe di Giacomo

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1632Born
30 Sep 165724.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 167340.3AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
12 Mar 167340.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
21 Mar 168451.3DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe di Giacomo
Bishop Giuseppe di Giacomo (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast