Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Pellegrini

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino e Frigento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613BornCastrovillari
13 Mar 167360.2AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
16 Apr 167360.3Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
6 May 167865.3DiedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pellegrini:
Bishop Carlo Pellegrini (died ) Bishop of Avellino e Frigento

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013