Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Zapata Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1615AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
10 Apr 1616Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
13 Jun 1621DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Zapata Osorio
Bishop Juan Zapata Osorio (died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,825
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 132, Number 847
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast