Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin de La Cassagne

Deceased

Bishop of Lescar, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹Born
2 Mar 171665.1SelectedBishop of Lescar, France
5 Dec 171867.9ConfirmedBishop of Lescar, France
26 Mar 171968.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lescar, France
13 Jan 172978.0DiedBishop of Lescar, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin de La Cassagne
Bishop Martin de La Cassagne (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Lescar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLescar

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast