Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestre de Crusy de Marcillac

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornCahors
20 Mar 162848.2SelectedBishop of Mende, France
31 Jul 162848.5ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
21 Dec 162848.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
21 Oct 166080.8DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvestre de Crusy de Marcillac:
Bishop Silvestre de Crusy de Marcillac (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 242
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015