Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Della Casa

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1754BornRome
21 Dec 177622.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 180248.5AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
26 Sep 180248.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
31 Mar 181864.0DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Della Casa:
Bishop Giuseppe Della Casa (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013